THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:34:56 AM
Yuh, Joseph Young Jae
CPSO#:
74979
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 307
2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1R 3A6
Phone: (416) 751-6141
Fax: (416) 751-5270
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSEPH YOUNG JAE YUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2002 |