THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 21:07:33 PM
Walsh, Cynthia Blanche
CPSO#:
74967
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Freeman, Cynthia Blanche (used until: 27 Aug 2006 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4221
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Almonte General Hospital |
Almonte |
Arnprior Regional Health |
Arnprior |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CYNTHIA BLANCHE WALSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALSH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 04 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 05 Jun 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2006 |