THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 23:03:33 PM
Valani, Rahim Amirali
CPSO#:
74962
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Dec 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Emergency Medicine
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Dec 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:24 May 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAHIM AMIRALI VALANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 15 Jun 2000 to 12 Jul 2000
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 13 Jul 2000 to 09 Aug 2000
EL - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 28 Feb 2004
CF - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2001 |