THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 3:04:09 AM
Auer, Rebecca Ann Craufurd
CPSO#:
74952
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jul 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Taylor, Rebecca Ann Craufurd (used until: 10 Jul 2007 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
Division of General Surgery
CCW 1617, Box 134
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 72791
Fax: (613) 737-8659
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REBECCA ANN CRAUFURD AUER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 28 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2007 |