THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:05:47 PM
Barker, Sarah Jane
CPSO#:
74943
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Apr 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
170 Colborne St W
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 327-9188
Fax: (705) 327-9189
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:18 Nov 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH JANE BARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 24 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 09 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2005 |