THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 6:55:02 AM
Landry, Vincent Lucien Joseph
CPSO#:
74940
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Landry, Joseph Lucien Vincent (used until: 19 Jun 2005 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Vincent Landry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 25 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VINCENT LUCIEN JOSEPH LANDRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANDRY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |