THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 10:02:40 AM
Anderson, Robert John
CPSO#:
74927
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |