THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 23:43:06 PM
Boake, Armour Isaac
CPSO#:
74925
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: McMaster University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
Renal Services
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6158
Fax: (807) 684-5841
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Atikokan General Hospital |
Atikokan |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Geraldton District Hospital |
Geraldton |
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Fort Frances |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
McCausland Hospital |
Terrace Bay |
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital |
Nipigon |
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital |
Red Lake |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:14 Sep 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARMOUR ISAAC BOAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOAKE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 2005 |