THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 6:01:50 AM
Christjanson, Lisa Jennifer
CPSO#:
74922
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Sep 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Sep 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oncology Clinic
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Phone: (905) 336-4103
Fax: (905) 336-6492
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:20 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LISA JENNIFER CHRISTJANSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTJANSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2002 to 30 Apr 2002
EL - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2005 |