THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:46:36 AM
McMillan, Hugh John
CPSO#:
74914
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 6137377600
Fax: 6137384879
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hugh John McMillan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HUGH JOHN MCMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMILLAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2004 |