THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:47:31 PM
Tenn-Lyn, Nicole Andrea
CPSO#:
74908
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oak Ridges Medical and Urgent Care
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: 905-773-1325
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: November 6, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On November 6, 2019, Mackenzie Health notified the College, pursuant to s.33(a) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective September 26, 2019 Dr. Tenn-Lyn’s privileges at Mackenzie Health were temporarily suspended, and effective October 10, 2019 Dr. Tenn-Lyn’s privileges were revoked.
Source: Hospital
Active Date: December 30, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On December 30, 2013, University Health Network (UHN) notified the College, pursuant to s.33(a) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Tenn-Lyn applied for reappointment to the medical staff at UHN for the 2013/14 year, but UHN did not reappoint Dr. Tenn-Lyn.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICOLE ANDREA TENN-LYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TENN-LYN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: August 14, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As from August 26, 2020, Dr. Tenn-Lyn has completed the requirements of her SCERP.
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)