THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 10:01:51 AM
Finlay, Marisa Heather Des Mazes
CPSO#:
74898
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 May 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Des Mazes, Marisa Heather (used until: 04 Jul 2000 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Site
Department of Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 4803
Fax: (905) 813-3962
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Marisa Finlay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:14 May 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARISA HEATHER DES MAZES FINLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINLAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 2007 |