THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 2:49:01 AM
Jamensky, Neil Thomas
CPSO#:
74894
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesiology
Scarborough Health Network
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON M1P 2V5
Phone: 647-491-0615
Fax: (905) 889-6096
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEIL THOMAS JAMENSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMENSKY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: May 3, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On May 3, 2022, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Neil Jamensky in respect of an incident that took place in April, 2009. The decision is under appeal.