THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:53:11 AM
Parker, Christopher Marshall
CPSO#:
74889
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Respirology
Department of Medicine
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 548-2384
Fax: (613) 549-1459
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C.M. Parker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 29 2017
Corporation Name: C.M. Parker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: C.M. Parker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 11 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:12 Sep 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MARSHALL PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2004 |