THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 21:29:50 PM
Arnaout, Amel
CPSO#:
74870
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Mar 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Mandarin
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
4th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81945
Fax: (613) 738-8261
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Amel Arnaout Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 26 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:13 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMEL ARNAOUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARNAOUT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 15 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 15 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Apr 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2006 |