THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:56:54 AM
Tunde-Byass, Modupe Olutoyin Julianah
CPSO#:
74868
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 440
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 497-4999
Fax: (416) 497-0011
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MODUPE OLUTOYIN JULIANAH TUNDE-BYASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUNDE-BYASS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2004 |