THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:18:38 PM
Emami, Shahram Sean
CPSO#:
74780
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Dec 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: University of Toronto, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Renew Medical Clinic
1015 Cawthra Road
Mississauga ON L5G 4K3
Phone: (905) 271-1134
Fax: (905) 271-1136
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAHRAM SEAN EMAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EMAMI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 17 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine
University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2001 to 29 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2003 |