THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 3:47:43 AM
Ling, Francis Tien Kwan
CPSO#:
74765
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Non-Binary
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
2475 McDougall Street
Windsor ON N8X 3N9
Phone: (519) 966-3888
Fax: (519) 967-8882
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Georgia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FRANCIS TIEN KWAN LING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LING is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |