THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:17:53 AM
McKay, Dana Lynn
CPSO#:
74764
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Oct 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Quinn, Dana Lynn (used until: 13 Dec 2022 )
McKay, Dana Lynn (used until: 07 Sep 2006 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
911 Queens Blvd
St. Mary's General Hospital
Department of Surgery
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: 519-744-3311
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Oct 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANA LYNN MCKAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Apr 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 May 2003 to 31 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2003 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2004 |