THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:47:17 PM
Reid, Stuart Edward
CPSO#:
74761
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Neurology
Connell 725
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 4343
Fax: (613) 548-2314
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STUART EDWARD REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 2006 |