THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:06:21 AM
Razvi, Yasar Syed
CPSO#:
74759
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Oct 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Medical Associates
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON L7G 0E3
Phone: (905) 873-3000
Fax: (905) 873-0800
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YASAR SYED RAZVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZVI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 2002 |