THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:03:09 PM
Cheung, Catherine Zee-Ming
CPSO#:
74757
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Aug 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: Queen's University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5415
Fax: (905) 813-3855
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ZEE-MING CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2004 |