THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:37:10 AM
Grill, Allan Kevin
CPSO#:
74728
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Apr 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Apr 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Markham Family Health Team
377 Church Street
Suite 101
Markham ON L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Fax: (905) 471-3627
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:31 Aug 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALLAN KEVIN GRILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRILL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 03 Feb 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2002 to 03 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2003 to 03 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Feb 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 2004 |