THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:03:10 AM
Morra, Dante Joseph
CPSO#:
74725
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
4th Floor CA Building
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 813-2447
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Dante Morra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANTE JOSEPH MORRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2004 |