THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 2:57:07 AM
Raja, Faisal Siddique
CPSO#:
74724
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Toronto, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site |
Paris |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:11 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Aug 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FAISAL SIDDIQUE RAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 01 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2010 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2011 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2002 |