THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 7:00:52 AM
Raynor, Christopher Fitzgerald
CPSO#:
74705
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Jamaican Creole
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Human 2.0
2202 Thurston Dr
Ottawa ON K1G 6E1
Phone: 613-730-5483
Fax: 613-482-1406
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:29 May 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER FITZGERALD RAYNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYNOR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2007 |