THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:52:08 PM
Habermehl, Lisa Marie
CPSO#:
74697
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Sep 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
51 K Highway 105
PO Box 311
Red Lake ON P0V 2M0
Phone: (807) 727-2617
Fax: (866) 665-1639
Electoral District: 09
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients who saw Dr Habermehl at the Woodlands Medical Associates clinic in Kenora, ON should request a copy of their medical record at the address above.
The Sunset Country Family Health Team
1 - 35 Wolsley St
Kenora, ON P9N 0H8
Phone: 807-468-6321
Fax: 807-468-3978
Date Received: 15 Jun 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital |
Red Lake |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Sep 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LISA MARIE HABERMEHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABERMEHL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 22 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2002 |