THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 12:00:17 PM
Rutherford, Patricia Anne
CPSO#:
74693
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jan 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jan 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5544 Sunshine Coast Highway
Sechelt Hopsital
Sechelt BC V0N 3A4
Phone: 604-885-6101
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Patricia Rutherford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Yukon
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Nov 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PATRICIA ANNE RUTHERFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUTHERFORD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2006 |