THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 8:30:29 AM
Rostami, Maryam
CPSO#:
74685
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
American Sign Language, English, French, Persian
Education: McMaster University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
574 Upper James St
Hamilton ON L9C 2Y6
Phone: (905) 387-4613
Fax: (905) 387-4910
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARYAM ROSTAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSTAMI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2002 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Feb 2012 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2019 |