THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 6:56:29 AM
Szirmay-Kalos, Tibor Zoltan
CPSO#:
74635
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 May 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian
Education: Medical University of Semmelweis, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: T. Szirmay-Kalos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 14 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can send an email to [email protected]
Date Received: 09 Mar 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jul 2021 |