THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:07:04 PM
van der Vyver, Marthinus Johannes
CPSO#:
74591
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Stellenbosch, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:17 Oct 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTHINUS JOHANNES VAN DER VYVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DER VYVER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2006 |