THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 5:04:05 AM
Mohammadzadeh, Gelareh
CPSO#:
74562
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Nov 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Nov 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: University of Manitoba, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 4-439
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5679
Fax: (416) 603-5298
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GELAREH MOHAMMADZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMADZADEH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2006 |