THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:33:34 PM
Tahiliani, Ravi
CPSO#:
74545
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
462 Paxton St
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Phone: 9059855572
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site |
Port Perry |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:30 Sep 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAVI TAHILIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHILIANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 06 Mar 2000 to 02 Apr 2000
EL - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Apr 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2002 |