THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:05:20 AM
Jain, Shauna Ashok
CPSO#:
74538
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jun 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Kotecha, Shauna Ashok (used until: 11 Aug 2003 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3050 Argentia Rd
Mississauga ON L5N 8E1
Phone: 905-785-3627
Fax: 905-785-3628
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Shauna Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 8 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAUNA ASHOK JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2000 to 31 Mar 2000
EL - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2003 |