THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:23:56 PM
Luo, Yigang
CPSO#:
74522
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: West China Medical University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Mar 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YIGANG LUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Apr 2002
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 May 2002 to 31 Oct 2002
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Feb 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Aug 2006 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |