THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:26:38 AM
Leung, Felix Kai-Ying
CPSO#:
74516
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300-2025 Midland Ave
Toronto ON M1P 3E2
Phone: 647-341-3832
Fax: 647-341-3830
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:11 Sep 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FELIX KAI-YING LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 07 Feb 2000 to 05 Mar 2000
EL - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Mar 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2002 |