THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 14:39:26 PM
Pascali, Dante Umberto
CPSO#:
74513
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: Queen's University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON K2G 5X2
Phone: (613) 761-9292
Fax: (613) 722-1310
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANTE UMBERTO PASCALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASCALI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 14 Feb 2000 to 12 Mar 2000
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Mar 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2003 |