THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:52:32 PM
Thomas, Sumesh Philip
CPSO#:
74504
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Benin, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S. Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 17 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Unit 89
10940 Bonaventure Drive Southeast
Calgary, AB T2J 5C8
Date Received: 08 Jun 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:13 Aug 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Feb 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 23 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Jun 2015 |