THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 6:25:55 AM
MacSween, Ruth Margaret
CPSO#:
74503
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jan 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Cambridge School of Clinic, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Limestone Dermatology
163 Brock Street
Kingston ON K7L 1S2
Phone: (613) 549-6660
Fax: (613) 547-2079
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RUTH MARGARET MACSWEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACSWEEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2000 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jan 2000 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2001 |