THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:08:46 AM
Nandagopal, Meena
CPSO#:
74465
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jan 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Jan 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Malayalam, Tamil, Telugu
Education: University of Madras, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Chedoke/McMaster Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1200 Main Street West MDCL 2110
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75171
Fax: (905) 523-1224
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:25 Jan 2002 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 10 Jan 2002
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Jan 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Feb 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 19 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
|
Active |