THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:42:16 AM
Rezvani Khorassani, Massoud
CPSO#:
74461
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 May 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 May 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Hamadan Medical School, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
250 Harding BLVD West
Suite 404
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 737-9898
Fax: (905) 737-8583
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:19 Jan 2007 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2002 to 25 Aug 2002
EL - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Mar 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 May 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 15 May 2009 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2009 |
|
Active |