THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 8:17:32 AM
Wong, Diane Catherine
CPSO#:
74457
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
154 Wellington St E
Aurora ON L4G 1J5
Phone: 905-726-9333
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DIANE CATHERINE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2000 to 30 Apr 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2001 |