THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 4:37:33 AM
Saxena, Akash Deep
CPSO#:
74432
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
809 Brant Street
Burlington ON L7R 2J4
Phone: (905) 338-3331
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 May 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AKASH DEEP SAXENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAXENA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 03 Jan 2000 to 30 Jan 2000
EL - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Jan 2000 to 28 Feb 2000
EL - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 2004 |