THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:51:46 AM
Wen, Joseph Yao Min
CPSO#:
74424
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 412
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 626-6097
Fax: (416) 626-6087
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:19 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSEPH YAO MIN WEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2000 to 29 Mar 2000
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Surgical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Mar 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2003 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: August 20, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)