THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:21:59 PM
Abdel-Bary, Mona Abdel-Moez Mohamed
CPSO#:
74419
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Dec 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Dec 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
9300 Noble Pkwy N
Minneapolis MN 55443-5500
United States
Phone: 7632363500
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mona Abdel-Bary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 25 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Minnesota
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:28 Nov 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONA ABDEL-MOEZ MOHAMED ABDEL-BARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-BARY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 09 Dec 1999 to 05 Jan 2000
EL - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2000 to 24 Jul 2000
EL - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2000 to 08 Dec 2000
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Jan 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Jul 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Dec 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2001 |