THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:34:07 PM
Shukle, Jacqueline Marie Chantal
CPSO#:
74410
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
150 Katimavik Rd
Kanata ON K2L 2N2
Phone: 6134820118
Fax: 6136040277
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:04 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE MARIE CHANTAL SHUKLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUKLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 29 Nov 1999 to 24 Dec 1999
EL - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 May 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Dec 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2004 |