THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:11:26 AM
Silversides, Candice Kristeen
CPSO#:
74403
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Sep 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Ontario Power Generation Building
3rd Floor, Room 3-913
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7732
Fax: (416) 586-8269
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:31 Dec 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CANDICE KRISTEEN SILVERSIDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERSIDES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 18 Nov 1999 to 15 Dec 1999
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Dec 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Jul 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2004 |