THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 1:54:37 AM
Mezody, Melitta
CPSO#:
74399
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian
Education: Medical University of Semmelweis, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
5MC 420 C
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 5798
Fax: (416) 603-5353
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:01 Jul 2002 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Nov 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Sep 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jun 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 May 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 May 2011 |
|
Active |