THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 13:10:26 PM
Varlese, Fabio
CPSO#:
74397
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Rome, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst Street
North York ON M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2613
Fax: (416) 785-2863
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Varlese Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2013
Corporation Name: F. Varlese Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 30 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Baycrest Hospital |
Toronto |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Runnymede Healthcare Centre |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:25 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:19 Sep 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FABIO VARLESE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARLESE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 08 Nov 1999 to 02 Dec 1999
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Dec 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2003 |