THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:30:17 AM
Jacyk, William Richard
CPSO#:
74369
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Oct 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Apr 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 Mar 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM RICHARD JACYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACYK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 1999 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Oct 1999 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 19 Oct 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2000 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: November 20, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)